+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (3)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020 SJ 8
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/17/2020, Room 100, SH, 09:00 am; SC 11
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5