+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On October 10, 2024 in the House:
- Died, Session ended 10/10/2024 HJ 17
On March 14, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Election Law HJ 1 P. 32
- Amendment # 2024-0910h: AA VV 03/14/2024 HJ 8 P. 48
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0910h: MF DV 186-189 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 03/14/2024 HJ 8 P. 53
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/05/2024 (Vote 10-10; RC)
On February 27, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/05/2024 09:00 am LOB 306-308
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/20/2024 09:00 am LOB 306-308