+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 233-83
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 19 (Vote 16-2; RC); HC 11
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 1/28/2014 10:00 AM LOB 208
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:30 AM LOB 208
On December 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary
+ − Vote
February 19, 2014: ITL
- Yeas: 233
- Nays: 83