+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/21/2024 HJ 9 P. 14
On March 15, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/11/2024 (Vote 16-0; CC)
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/11/2024 09:30 am LOB 301-303
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/13/2024 02:15 pm LOB 301-303
On December 1, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government