+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA Div 200-88
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-4; RC); HC 13
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 1/28/2014 10:00 AM LOB 208
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 11:00 AM LOB 208
On December 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor