+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 188-171 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 70
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/15/2024 (Vote 16-4; RC) HC 9 P. 23
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/15/2024 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On November 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor