+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 10
On May 19, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 05/17/2023 (Vote 9-0; CC)
On May 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/17/2023 10:00 am LOB 301-303
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 09:00 am LOB 301-303
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Legislative Administration
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass, RC 24Y-0N, MA, by Necessary 3/5; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023 SJ 10
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/07/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:45 am; SC 12
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/14/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 8
+ − Vote
March 16, 2023: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Yea
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Yea
- Donovan Fenton: Yea
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Yea
- Rebecca Whitley: Yea
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Yea
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea