+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. File No. 44.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment.
On June 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee. From committee: Without recommendation. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor