+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. File No. 23.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Resolution read and adopted. To Senate.
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution read and adopted. To Assembly.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Growth and Infrastructure
Type:
Primary Sponsor