+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. File No. 26.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Resolution read. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 11, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Resolution File. Resolution read. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor