+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- File No. 33.
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 6, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 572.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On February 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 6
April 21, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Operations and Elections
Type:
Primary Sponsor