+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 118.) To printer.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 15, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor