+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. File No. 22.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor