+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. File No. 40.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. Placed on Resolution File. Resolution read and adopted. To Senate.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from Resolution File. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
On May 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Resolution read and adopted, as amended. To Assembly.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolution read. Amended. (Amend. No. 124.) To printer.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor