+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- File No. 54.
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- To enrollment.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- To printer.
- Conference report adopted by Assembly.
On June 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report adopted by Senate.
- From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 691 and further amend.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment No. 691 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
On May 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 691 not concurred in. To Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 691.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 1
April 1, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor