+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. File No. 21.
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Resolution read. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.
On May 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 19, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On April 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Resolution read. Amended. (Amend. No. 204.) To printer. From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Resolution read. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended.
On March 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor