+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 280.
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment No. 600 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Senate. In Senate.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 600.) To printer.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 350.) To printer.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor