+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 295.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 845 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 7, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Chief Clerk's desk. Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. Placed on General File. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 845.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer.
On April 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 4.) To printer.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On November 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On November 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Commerce and Labor
Type:
Primary Sponsor