+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 599.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- To enrollment.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1091.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer. From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1132.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To printer. From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Assembly Amendment No. 1132 concurred in.
On June 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 131.) Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On November 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On November 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor