+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 545.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 816. Conference report adopted by Senate. Conference report adopted by Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment No. 816 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 816 not concurred in. To Assembly.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 816.) To printer.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 128.) To printer.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On November 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor