+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 502.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 773.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice of exemption.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On December 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
May 26, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor