+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 142.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Assembly Amendment Nos. 598 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 11, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 598.) To printer.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 449.) To printer.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 348.) To printer.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On November 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor