+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 523.
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On June 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee. From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor