+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 77.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On December 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor