+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor. Approved by the Governor. Chapter 400.
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1028.) To printer.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor