+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 23.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.) To Senate.
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On November 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor