+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 657.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Notice of eligibility for exemption. Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 170.) To printer.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor