+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 254.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 4.) To Senate.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor