+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 433.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 11, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
- Placed on General File.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
- Read second time.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 11
May 19, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor