+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391.
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
On May 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
- Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Assembly.
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 979.) To printer.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
- Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
On March 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Exemption effective.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
June 1, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 39
May 28, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 14
May 27, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 18
April 30, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 2