+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 614.
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1124.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To printer. From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Assembly Amendment No. 1124 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1006.) To printer.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor