+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 523.
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- To enrollment.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
- Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice of exemption.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 3, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
May 29, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
May 20, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
April 15, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor