+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 529.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment.
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 923.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To printer.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Notice of eligibility for exemption. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 238.) To printer.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor