+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 347.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor