+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 433.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 5, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor