+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To committee.
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections.
- In Assembly.
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 597.) To printer.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- EXEMPT, Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a).
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 18, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor