+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 340.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. Waiver granted effective: May 6, 2021.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor