+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. Waiver granted effective: April 17, 2015.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 443.) To printer.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
Type:
Primary Sponsor