+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 186.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment. Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 689.) To printer.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice of exemption.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor