+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 425.
On June 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On June 4, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On June 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On June 2, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
On June 1, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To committee.
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Notice of eligibility for exemption. Read second time. Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee.
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor