+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter 279.
- Approved by the Governor.
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On May 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee.
- Read second time.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
May 20, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor