+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 382.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To Senate.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass, as amended.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Exemption effective.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 389.)
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
May 14, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor