+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 321.
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Assembly Amendment No. 747 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 11, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 747.) To printer.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 609.) To printer.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor