+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 197.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Assembly.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. To committee.
On November 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On November 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Senate Committee on Growth and Infrastructure
Type:
Primary Sponsor