+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 267.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
- In Assembly.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 415.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 20, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
April 21, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
March 4, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor