+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 416.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 790 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 790.) To printer.
On April 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor