+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly Amendment No. 681 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 681.) To printer.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 217.) To printer.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor