+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 265.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. To Senate. In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Action of adoption of Amendment No. 909 rescinded. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To printer.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 909.) To printer.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Education. Rereferred to Committee on Education. To committee.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 612.) To printer.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.