+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 221.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor