+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 298.
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To enrollment.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor